MA H5015 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2556
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 322 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 322 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Dudley to grant additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk off the premises
Title
Authorizing the town of Dudley to grant additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk off the premises
Sponsors
House Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure | Sen. Peter Durant [R] | Sen. Ryan Fattman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-28 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 322 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-12-22 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-12-22 | House | Enacted |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-10-17 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-10-13 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-09-15 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-09-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-09-15 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-07-12 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-07-12 | House | New draft of S2556 and H4187 |
2022-07-12 | House | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S2556 (Replaces) 2022-07-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5015
H4187 (Similar To) 2022-07-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5015
H380 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
H3831 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4240
H3715 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3813
H3712 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2022
H4187 (Similar To) 2022-07-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5015
H380 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
H3831 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4240
H3715 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3813
H3712 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5015 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5015.pdf |