MA H5027 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 382 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 382 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substituted by the House, on motion of Mr. Speliotis of Danvers, for a bill with the same title (House, No. 5002). December 28, 2018.
Title
Exempting positions in the Department of Public Works in the Town of Billerica from the Civil Service Law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-07 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 382 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2019-01-01 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2019-01-01 | House | Enacted |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading and passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-28 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-28 | House | Substituted for H5002 |
Same As/Similar To
H5002 (Similar To) 2018-12-28 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H5027
H1605 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1606 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4215
H1607 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1569 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1605 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1606 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4215
H1607 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1569 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H5027 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H5027.pdf |