MA H5028 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4554
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-6-1)
Status: Introduced on July 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-14 - Text of an amendment, see H4554
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-14 - Text of an amendment, see H4554
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Similar Bills
Title
Similar Bills
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-14 | House | Text of an amendment, see H4554 |
Same As/Similar To
H4554 (Replaced by) 2022-07-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 117 of the Acts of 2022
S334 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2017 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S327 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1089 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S994 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied H1907
H1907 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - New draft substituted, see H4554
S334 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2017 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S327 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1089 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S994 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied H1907
H1907 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - New draft substituted, see H4554
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5028 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5028.pdf |