MA H5034 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on August 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-03 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Municipalities and Regional Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-03 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Municipalities and Regional Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a festival of the hills committee in the town of Conway. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Establishing a festival of the hills committee for the town of Conway
Sponsors
Rep. Natalie Blais [D] | Sen. Paul Mark [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-08-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H3792 (Similar To) 2023-07-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2448 (Similar To) 2023-12-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 81 of the Acts of 2023
H3575 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2024
H2448 (Similar To) 2023-12-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 81 of the Acts of 2023
H3575 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2024
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H5034 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H5034.pdf |