MA H504 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4299
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4299
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4299
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to assist school districts in developing a program to identify and serve pupils with light-based reading difficulties, such as scotopic sensitivity. Education.
Title
Requiring school districts to adopt a certain health program
Sponsors
Rep. David Vieira [R] | Rep. Randy Hunt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-16 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4299 |
2015-06-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/17/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4299 (Replaced by) 2016-05-16 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1647 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1646 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H3109 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H1645 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2841 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H1647 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1646 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H3109 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H1645 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2841 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H504 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H504.pdf |