MA H5068 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4271
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 334 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 334 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Dedham to grant one additional license for the sale of wine and malt to be drunk on premises
Title
Authorizing the town of Dedham to grant one additional license for the sale of wine and malt to be drunk on premises
Sponsors
House Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure | Rep. Paul McMurtry [D] | Sen. Michael Rush [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-12 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 334 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Enacted |
2021-01-06 | House | Enacted |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Bills in the Third Reading discharge report accepted |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Read third |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-01-05 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2021-01-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-12-03 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-12-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-12-03 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2020-10-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-10-22 | House | New draft of H4271 |
2020-10-22 | House | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4271 (Replaces) 2020-10-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5068
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H5068 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H5068.pdf |