MA H509 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5159
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the feasibility of ergonomically designed school buildings and its beneficial impact on students and faculty. Education.
Title
Relative to the consideration of ergonomically designed school buildings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-03 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5159 |
2019-07-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H5159 (Replaced by) 2020-12-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H509 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H509.pdf |