MA H51 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-01 - Transferred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-01 - Transferred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Financing the immediate economic revitalization, community development, and housing needs of the Commonwealth
Title
Financing the immediate economic revitalization, community development, and housing needs of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-01 | House | Transferred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2023-01-26 | House | Referred to the temporary committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H4581 (Similar To) 2024-05-30 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4703 (Similar To) 2024-06-27 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4757 (Similar To) 2024-07-15 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4828 (Similar To) 2024-07-15 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4854 (Similar To) 2024-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4703 (Similar To) 2024-06-27 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4757 (Similar To) 2024-07-15 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4828 (Similar To) 2024-07-15 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4854 (Similar To) 2024-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H51 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H51.pdf |