MA H5130 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5050
Note: Legislation replaced by H5132
Note: Legislation replaced by H5132
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 141 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 141 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Section 171 contained in the engrossed Bill making appropriations for the fiscal year 2023 (see House, No. 5050), which had been returned by His Excellency the Governor with recommendation of amendment (for message, see Attachment Y of House, No. 5132). July 28, 2022.
Title
Relative to a purchase option on a University of Massachusetts at Dartmouth leased facility in New Bedford
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-04 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 141 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-07-31 | Senate | Re-enacted and again laid before the Governor |
2022-07-31 | House | Re-enacted |
2022-07-31 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2022-07-31 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2022-07-31 | Senate | Governor's amendment adopted |
2022-07-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-07-30 | House | Governor's amendment accepted |
2022-07-30 | House | Governor's amendment considered (in the form approved by the committee on Bills in the Third Reading) |
2022-07-30 | House | Bills in the Third Reading special report accepted |
2022-07-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-28 | House | Referred to the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading |
2022-07-28 | House | For message, see H5132, Attachment Y |
2022-07-28 | Governor returned to the House with recommendation of amendment | |
2022-07-28 | House | Enacted as section 171 of the General Appropriation Bill, see H5050 |
Same As/Similar To
H5050 (Replaced by) 2022-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 126 of the Acts of 2022
H5132 (Replaced by) 2022-07-28 - See H5050
S13 (Similar To) 2021-02-08 - See S9
H5132 (Replaced by) 2022-07-28 - See H5050
S13 (Similar To) 2021-02-08 - See S9
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5130 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5130.pdf |