MA H5142 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 171 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 171 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to certain land in the town of Winchester
Title
Relative to certain land in the town of Winchester
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-07-31 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #238 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-10 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 171 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-07-31 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2022-07-31 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #238 (Yeas 39 to Nays 0) |
2022-07-31 | House | Enacted - 153 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY, No. 260) |
2022-07-30 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-30 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-29 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-29 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-07-29 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-07-29 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S1357 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 58 of the Acts of 2022
S2101 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2115 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3178 (Similar To) 2021-11-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 94 of the Acts of 2021
H2193 (Similar To) 2022-02-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 14 of the Acts of 2022
H4108 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 40 of the Acts of 2022
S2101 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2115 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3178 (Similar To) 2021-11-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 94 of the Acts of 2021
H2193 (Similar To) 2022-02-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 14 of the Acts of 2022
H4108 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 40 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5142 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5142.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov/RollCall/192/SenateRollCall238.pdf |