MA H525 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1859
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-16 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-16 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to educational collaboratives. Education.
Title
Relative to educational collabratives
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-16 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2019-07-25 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-07-25 | House | Accompanied by S1859 |
2019-06-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-03-27 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S254 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S534 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2463
S1593 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H515 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H498 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
H409 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H2127 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1859 (Replaces) 2019-07-25 - Accompanied H525
S2348 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
H4135 (Similar To) 2019-10-21 - Adopted, see S2365
H4137 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Published as amended, see H4145
H4145 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - See S2365
S2412 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019
S534 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2463
S1593 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H515 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H498 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
H409 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H2127 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1859 (Replaces) 2019-07-25 - Accompanied H525
S2348 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
H4135 (Similar To) 2019-10-21 - Adopted, see S2365
H4137 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Published as amended, see H4145
H4145 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - See S2365
S2412 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H525 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H525.pdf |