MA H530 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4484
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4484
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4484
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing multi-disciplinary teams with district attorneys to investigate elder abuse. Elder Affairs.
Title
Relative to establishing multi-disciplinary teams with district attorneys to investigate elder abuse
Sponsors
Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R] | Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D] | Rep. Patricia Haddad [D] | Sen. Walter Timilty [D] |
Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] | Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-11 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4484 |
2015-10-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/05/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H4484 (Replaced by) 2016-07-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H115 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H116 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H117 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H250 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H251 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H115 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H116 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H117 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H250 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H251 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H530 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H530.pdf |