MA H5300 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 22 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 22 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the appropriation and expenditure of community preservation funds for community housing purposes in the town of Eastham. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Facilitating the appropriation and expenditure of community preservation funds for community housing purposes in the town of Eastham
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Peake [D] | Sen. Julian Cyr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-10-17 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-10-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-10-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-10-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-10-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/07/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-09-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-09-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S148 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S597 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
S600 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
H3087 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
H3794 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 317 of the Acts of 2022
H3986 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 21 of the Acts of 2022
H4192 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5301 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5299 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S597 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
S600 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
H3087 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
H3794 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 317 of the Acts of 2022
H3986 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 21 of the Acts of 2022
H4192 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5301 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5299 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5300 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5300.pdf |