MA H536 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-09-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-09-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to deceptive actions perpetrated against elderly and disabled persons. Elder Affairs.
Title
Increasing the penalties for unfair and deceptive actions perpetrated against persons with disabilities and senior citizens
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2013-06-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2013 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in 437 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Elder Affairs |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H536 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H536.pdf |