MA H543 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
For legislation to provide for the establishment of senior citizen safety zones in cities and towns
Title
Provide for the establishment of senior citizen safety zones in cities and towns
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-26 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | |
2010-08-26 | Rules suspended | |
2010-08-26 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | |
2010-07-21 | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling | |
2010-07-15 | Recommitted to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government | |
2010-07-15 | Rules suspended | |
2010-07-15 | Committee recommended ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) | |
2010-02-08 | Senate concurred | |
2010-02-04 | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government | |
2009-12-30 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling | |
2009-01-20 | Public Hearing date 9/23 at 10:00 AM in Hearing Room B1 | |
2009-01-20 | Senate concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.mass.gov/legis/186history/h00543.htm |
Text | http://www.mass.gov/legis/bills/house/186/ht00/ht00543.htm |