MA H5446 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3477
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 423 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 423 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to temporary registration plates
Title
Relative to temporary registration plates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-05 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 423 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2023-01-03 | House | Enacted |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-12-29 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-12-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-12-29 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-12-29 | House | New draft of H3477 |
2022-12-29 | House | Pending new draft of H3477 |
2022-12-29 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H3477 (Replaces) 2022-12-29 - New draft substituted, see H5446
H471 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H471 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5446 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5446.pdf |