MA H545 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S292
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - Accompanied S292
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - Accompanied S292
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to residential habilitation services for individuals age sixty or older. Elder Affairs.
Title
Regarding equal choice and related cost savings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Senate | Accompanied S292 |
2013-04-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/06/2013 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Worcester Senior Center |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S292 (Replaced by) 2014-05-21 - Accompanied a study order, see S2148
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H545 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H545.pdf |