MA H545 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5159
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the use of sun protection in public schools and youth camps. Education.
Title
Relative to sun safety
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Peake [D] | Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] | Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D] | Rep. Kate Hogan [D] |
Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Sen. Julian Cyr [D] | Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] | Rep. David Vieira [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-03 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5159 |
2019-05-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/03/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H5159 (Replaced by) 2020-12-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H545 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H545.pdf |