MA H57 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H55
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 3 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 3 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act making appropriations for the fiscal year 2013 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects House bill No. 55, as changed by the committee on Bills in the Third Reading, and as amended and passed to be engrossed by the House. February 6, 2013.
Title
Making appropriations for the fiscal year 2013 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-15 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 3 of the Acts of 2013 | |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2013-02-14 | House | Enacted |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2013-02-14 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2013-02-14 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #16 [YEAS 31 - NAYS 1] |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Read third |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Amendment #33 (Brewer) adopted |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Hedlund) rejected - Roll Call #15 [YEAS 12 - NAYS 25] |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Hedlund) rejected - Roll Call #14 [YEAS 12 - NAYS 25] |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Amendment #32 (Keenan) rejected |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Amendment #31 (Keenan) rejected |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Amendment #30 (Tarr) rejected |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Amendment #26 (Tarr) rejected |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Amendment #25 (Tarr) rejected |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Amendment #24 (Tarr) rejected |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Amendment #23 (Tarr) ruled unconstitutional |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Amendment #21 (Tarr) rejected |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Amendment #19 (Tarr) rejected |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Amendment #18 (Tarr) rejected |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Amendment #17 (Tarr) rejected |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Amendment #16 (Tarr) rejected |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Amendment #15 (Tarr) rejected |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Amendment #14 (Tarr) ruled unconstitutional |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Amendment #12 (Tarr) rejected - Roll Call #13 [YEAS 6 - NAYS 31] |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Amendment #11 (Tarr) rejected |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Amendment #9 (Tarr) rejected |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Amendment #8 (Tarr) rejected - Roll Call #12 [YEAS 5 - NAYS 33] |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Amendment #7 (Knapik) rejected |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Amendment #6 (Ross) rejected |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Amendment #5 (Ross) rejected |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Hedlund) rejected - Roll Call #11 [YEAS 5 - NAYS 30] |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Downing) rejected |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 12, 2013 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Read |
2013-02-06 | House | H55, published as amended |
Same As/Similar To
H55 (Replaces) 2013-02-06 - Published as amended, see H57
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H57 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H57.pdf |