MA H573 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 122 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 122 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Truro to lease certain land to the town of Provincetown for the purpose of developing water wells. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Truro to lease certain land to the town of Provincetown
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Peake [D] | Sen. Daniel Wolf [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-23 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 122 of the Acts of 2011 | |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2011-09-15 | Senate | Enacted (see Roll Call No. 64 - Yeas 34 - Nays 0) |
2011-09-14 | House | Enacted - 149 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 105) |
2011-08-22 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-08-22 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2011-08-08 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2011-08-04 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-07-07 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-07-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-07-07 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2011-06-16 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/15/2011 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H573 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=11571&generalCourtId=1 |