MA H58 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to authorizing the city of Springfield to convey certain park land and to grant a license agreement over certain park land to UNIFIRST Corporation. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Springfield to convey certain park land and to grant a license agreement over certain park land to UNIFIRST Corporation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-17 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2013 | |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Enacted - Roll Call #18 [35 YEAS to 0 NAYS] |
2013-04-03 | House | Enacted 152 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 41) |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-03-25 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-03-14 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-03-14 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2013-03-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-02-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/06/2013 from 10:00 AM-11:00 AM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H58 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H58.pdf |