MA H58 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-28 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-28 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Richard Gurney, an employee of the Department of Correction. Temporary Rules.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Richard Gurney, an employee of the Massachusetts Department of Correction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-28 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-01-27 | House | Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed |
2021-01-27 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2021-01-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to the temporary committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4318 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4582 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4582 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H58 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H58.pdf |