MA H6 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3512
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3512
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3512
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Accompanying the third recommendation of the Department of the State Auditor (House, No. 3) as relates to to financial requirements of business, correspondence and trade schools. Higher Education.
Title
Relative to financial requirements of business, correspondence and trade schools
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-16 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3512 |
2011-05-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2011 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
H3512 (Replaced by) 2012-02-08 - Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means)
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H6 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=7793&generalCourtId=1 |