MA H60 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4632
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4632
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4632
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the security and the protection of personal information by establishing the Massachusetts information privacy and security act. Advanced Information Technology, the Internet and Cybersecurity.
Title
Establishing the Massachusetts information privacy and security act
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Carey [D] | Rep. Mindy Domb [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-13 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4632 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-04-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 6, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-10-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Advanced Information Technology, the Internet and Cybersecurity |
Same As/Similar To
S227 (Similar To) 2024-05-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4632
S1133 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
H1428 (Similar To) 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
H1707 (Similar To) 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
H4632 (Replaced by) 2024-05-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1133 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
H1428 (Similar To) 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
H1707 (Similar To) 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
H4632 (Replaced by) 2024-05-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H60 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H60.pdf |