MA H601 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4424
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4424
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4424
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representatives Vargas of Haverhill and Domb of Amherst, a petition of Andres X. Vargas, Mindy Domb and others that the Department of Elementary and Secondary Education be authorized to promote and facilitate food literacy programs in school districts, charter schools, approved private day or residential schools, or collaborative schools. Education.
Title
To promote food literacy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4424 |
2023-10-05 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-09-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/10/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S310 (Similar To) 2024-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2588
S2588 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4424 (Replaced by) 2024-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2588 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4424 (Replaced by) 2024-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H601 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H601.pdf |