MA H606 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5093
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5093
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5093
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Gordon of Bedford, a petition of Kenneth I. Gordon for an investigation by a task force (including members of the General Court) established by the Department of Elementary and Secondary Education on educational inequities in Middlesex County. Education.
Title
To address inequities the Massachusetts public school system
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5093 |
2021-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H101 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5218
S322 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S323 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2493 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4003 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 30 of the Acts of 2021
H4018 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 75 of the Acts of 2021
H4056 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4018
S329 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S326 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S327 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2350 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2621
S1280 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S353 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
H627 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5073
H2397 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S87 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2954
S1382 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S338 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2748
S1445 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - New draft substituted, see S2730
S878 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S294 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2493
S295 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H5093 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5363 (Similar To) 2022-11-03 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1277 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
S322 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S323 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2493 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4003 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 30 of the Acts of 2021
H4018 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 75 of the Acts of 2021
H4056 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4018
S329 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S326 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S327 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2350 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2621
S1280 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S353 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
H627 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5073
H2397 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S87 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2954
S1382 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S338 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2748
S1445 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - New draft substituted, see S2730
S878 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S294 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2493
S295 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H5093 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5363 (Similar To) 2022-11-03 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1277 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H606 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H606.pdf |