MA H608 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-05 - Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-05 - Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to further regulating the Assisted Living Advisory Council. Elder Affairs.
Title
Further regulating the Assisted Living Advisory Council
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-05 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2021-01-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-01-23 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-01-23 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2020-01-13 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-10-30 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2019-04-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H1841 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S370 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S379 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S374 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
H2475 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H4063 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5079
H595 (Similar To) 2020-08-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4401
S370 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S379 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S374 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
H2475 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H4063 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5079
H595 (Similar To) 2020-08-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4401
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H608 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H608.pdf |