MA H62 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the authority of the Disabled Persons Protection Commission. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to the authority of the Disabled Persons Protection Commission
Sponsors
Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. George Ross [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2011-09-14 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2011-02-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/17/2011 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H62 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=10839&generalCourtId=1 |