MA H62 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-29 - Placed on file
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-29 - Placed on file
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to voting by qualified voters of the Commonwealth who are also poll workers. Election Laws.
Title
Proposal for a legislative amendment to the Constitution relative to voting by qualified voters of the Commonwealth who are also poll workers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | Senate | Placed on file |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2013-04-29 | House | Placed on file |
2013-04-29 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2013-04-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/27/2013 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Election Laws |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H62 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H62.pdf |