MA H622 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5135
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5135
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5135
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing bleeding control training as part of the health education curriculum in public schools. Education.
Title
Providing for bleeding control training as part of the health education curriculum
Sponsors
Rep. Kate Hogan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5135 |
2021-09-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H616 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5135
S284 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H567 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5135
H1715 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H5135 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S284 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H567 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5135
H1715 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H5135 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H622 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H622.pdf |