MA H623 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-16 - Senate concurred
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-16 - Senate concurred
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the disposition of public lands with conservation protected status. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To protect the natural resources of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-05-12 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday, April 4, 2016, pending concurrence |
2015-06-02 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 06/02/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-05-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 437 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H68 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H785 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H786 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H783 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H784 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H785 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H786 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H783 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H784 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H623 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H623.pdf |