MA H624 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5099
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5099
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5099
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to education costs of children with disabilities. Education.
Title
Relative to independent child protection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5099 |
2021-06-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/06/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H545 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3978
S2390 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1950 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
S377 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2496
S2496 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S763 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Accompanied S762
S843 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Senate concurred
S1901 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
H5099 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3978 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2390 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1950 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
S377 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2496
S2496 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S763 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Accompanied S762
S843 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Senate concurred
S1901 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
H5099 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3978 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H624 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H624.pdf |