MA H625 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4164
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4164
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4164
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to bow hunting for deer in Wompatuck State Park. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to bow hunting for deer in Wompatuck State Park
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4164 |
2015-11-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Division of Fisheries and Wildlife |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4164 (Replaced by) 2016-04-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1685 (Similar To) 2015-11-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1187 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4105
H316 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4297
H2713 (Similar To) 2016-03-17 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H74 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H1685 (Similar To) 2015-11-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1187 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4105
H316 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4297
H2713 (Similar To) 2016-03-17 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H74 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H625 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H625.pdf |