MA H655 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4740
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4740
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4740
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to right of first refusal in the event of foreclosure and short sales and deeds. Housing.
Title
Regarding right of first refusal in the event of foreclosure and short sales and deeds in lieu
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4740 |
2018-01-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/23/2018 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
S500 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S841 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S903 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S884 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S763 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H3059 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4740 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S841 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S903 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S884 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S763 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H3059 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4740 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H655 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H655.pdf |