MA H668 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4668
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4668
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4668
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the costs imposed upon the municipal and district ratepayers due to public drinking water, wastewater and stormwater systems capital upgrades. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To assist municipal and district ratepayers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-03 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4668 |
2015-10-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/06/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in DCR Quabbin Bluemeadow Conference Center |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4668 (Replaced by) 2016-10-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2501 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1286 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H364 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H2991 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H363 (Similar To) 2016-08-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4582
H2501 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1286 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H364 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H2991 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H363 (Similar To) 2016-08-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4582
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H668 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H668.pdf |