MA H678 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 23 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-23 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on August 23 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-23 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the effective date of city and ward voting precincts
Title
The effective date of city and ward voting precincts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-23 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | |
2010-08-19 | Enacted | |
2010-08-16 | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed | |
2010-08-16 | Rules suspended | |
2010-08-16 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | |
2010-08-02 | Read; and referred to the Senate Committee on Ethics and Rules | |
2010-07-31 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | |
2010-07-31 | Rules suspended | |
2009-09-23 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | |
2009-09-16 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading | |
2009-07-20 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling | |
2009-01-20 | Public Hearing date 6/3 at 1:00 PM in Hearing Room A-1 | |
2009-01-20 | Senate concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.mass.gov/legis/186history/h00678.htm |
Text | http://www.mass.gov/legis/bills/house/186/ht00/ht00678.htm |