MA H679 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4648
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4648
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4648
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing municipal notices to the public of hazardous waste sites. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Providing for notice to the public of hazardous waste sites
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4648 |
2015-09-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/29/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4648 (Replaced by) 2016-09-29 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H385 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
H382 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H146 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4120
H191 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H1321 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H385 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
H382 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H146 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4120
H191 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H1321 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H679 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H679.pdf |