MA H700 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4649
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish rules and regulations for the fishing of herring within the waters of the Commonwealth. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to inshore resource depletion
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Kocot [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4649 |
2015-10-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/05/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4649 (Replaced by) 2016-09-29 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2773 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1728 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2003 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H2146 (Similar To) 2016-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3026 (Similar To) 2016-06-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2773 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1728 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2003 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H2146 (Similar To) 2016-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3026 (Similar To) 2016-06-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H700 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H700.pdf |