MA H704 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S426
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee On Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee On Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the mosquito borne disease control board
Title
The mosquito borne disease control board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-15 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee On Ways and Means | |
2010-06-15 | Accompanied by S426 | |
2010-05-20 | Reporting date extended to Tuesday, June 15, 2010 | |
2009-01-20 | Public Hearing date 12/15 at 11:00 AM in Hearing Room A2 | |
2009-01-20 | Senate concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S426 (Replaces) 2010-06-15 - Accompanied H704
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.mass.gov/legis/186history/h00704.htm |
Text | http://www.mass.gov/legis/bills/house/186/ht00/ht00704.htm |