MA H704 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to designating the former Canton airport site as the 1st Lt. Arthur E. Farnham, Jr., and SSgt. Thomas M. Connolly, Jr. Memorial Park, Neponset River Reservation. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Designating the former Canton airport site as the 1st Lt. Arthur E. Farnham, Jr., and SSgt. Thomas M. Connolly, Jr. Memorial Park, Neponset River Reservation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Senate | No further action taken |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2013-04-11 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2013-04-03 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-04-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-04-03 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2013-04-01 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-03-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/21/2013 from 02:30 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H704 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H704.pdf |