MA H706 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5143
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5143
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5143
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the protection of medical exemptions for immunizations for school attendance. Education.
Title
Relative to the protection of medical exemptions for immunizations for school attendance
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Soter [R] | Rep. Christina Minicucci [D] | Rep. Joseph McKenna [R] | Rep. Shawn Dooley [R] |
Rep. Steven Xiarhos [R] | Rep. Paul Donato [D] | Rep. Colleen Garry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5143 |
2021-12-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/04/2022 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H2228 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
S1398 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1468 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S330 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H5143 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1398 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1468 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S330 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H5143 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H706 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H706.pdf |