MA H716 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4431
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4431
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4431
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the costs imposed upon the municipal and district ratepayers due to public drinking water, wastewater and stormwater systems capital upgrades. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To assist municipal and district ratepayers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-28 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4431 |
2013-09-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2013 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4431 (Replaced by) 2014-08-28 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H716 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H716.pdf |