MA H728 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4055
Note: Legislation replaced by H713
Note: Legislation replaced by H713
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-22 - Accompanied H713
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-22 - Accompanied H713
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the use of crossbows in hunting. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to the use of crossbows in hunting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-22 | House | Accompanied H713 |
2014-04-24 | House | Recommitted to the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
2014-04-24 | House | Reported on a part of H4055 |
2014-04-24 | House | Reported from the committee on House Rules |
2014-04-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4055 |
2013-10-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/23/2013 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4055 (Replaced by) 2014-04-24 - Reported, in part, by H728
H713 (Replaced by) 2014-06-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H713 (Replaced by) 2014-06-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H728 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H728.pdf |