MA H736 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4007
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4007
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4007
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to environmental performance standards for plumbing fixtures. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to environmental performance standards for plumbing fixtures
Sponsors
Sen. John Keenan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4007 |
2013-09-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2013 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4007 (Replaced by) 2014-04-22 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H736 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H736.pdf |