MA H750 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4503
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4503
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4503
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to exempt medical supplies used in monitoring diabetes from the sales tax. Revenue.
Title
Providing for an exemption from the sales tax for certain medical devices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4503 |
2011-05-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/12/2011 from 10:30 AM-02:30 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred. |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Revenue. |
2011-01-14 | House | Bill Filed. |
Same As/Similar To
H4503 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H750 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=9681&generalCourtId=1 |