MA H753 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S470
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-22 - Accompanied S470
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-22 - Accompanied S470
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to recycling by state agencies. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to public space recycling
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-22 | Senate | Accompanied S470 |
2019-03-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/02/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H747 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
S1864 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H2706 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S498 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Accompanied S520
S494 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Accompanied S520
S470 (Replaced by) 2019-07-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S495 (Similar To) 2019-10-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2388
S2388 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1864 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H2706 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S498 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Accompanied S520
S494 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Accompanied S520
S470 (Replaced by) 2019-07-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S495 (Similar To) 2019-10-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2388
S2388 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H753 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H753.pdf |