MA H757 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4668
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4668
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4668
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to develop science-based stream-flow standards. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to streamflow standards
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Smizik [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. Louis Kafka [D] | Rep. Peter Kocot [D] |
Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D] | Rep. Ruth Balser [D] | Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D] | Rep. James Cantwell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-03 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4668 |
2015-10-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4668 (Replaced by) 2016-10-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H485 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
H486 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H487 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H2681 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4028
H2826 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H485 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
H486 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H487 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H2681 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4028
H2826 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H757 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H757.pdf |