MA H769 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S446
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Accompanied S446
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Accompanied S446
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to expanding access to trails for people of all abilities. Environment and Natural Resources.
Title
Expanding access to trails for people of all abilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Accompanied S446 |
2023-09-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/11/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
S1260 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
H2605 (Similar To) 2024-07-30 - Senate concurred
S334 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2664
H3992 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4503
H4058 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S446 (Replaced by) 2024-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2605 (Similar To) 2024-07-30 - Senate concurred
S334 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2664
H3992 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4503
H4058 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S446 (Replaced by) 2024-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H769 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H769.pdf |