MA H77 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4613
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure continued health insurance coverage for certain children. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
To ensure continued health insurance coverage for children
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4613 |
2015-11-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/17/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H4613 (Replaced by) 2016-09-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4738 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 384 of the Acts of 2016
H2255 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2473 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2256 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2257 (Similar To) 2016-02-22 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4738 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 384 of the Acts of 2016
H2255 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2473 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2256 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2257 (Similar To) 2016-02-22 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H77 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H77.pdf |