MA H78 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Placed on file, in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Placed on file, in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Day of Stoneham (by request), a petition of Vincent Lawrence Dixon for a proposal for a legislative amendment to the Constitution for a Constitutional right to housing. Housing.
Title
Proposal for a legislative amendment to the Constitution for a Constitutional Right to Housing
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Day [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Placed on file, in concurrence |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 23) and placed on file |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H3809 (Similar To) 2021-12-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2021
H3891 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2470 (Similar To) 2021-10-05 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted
S2471 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H4059 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4083 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2022
H1376 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4686
H2986 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S883 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S1419 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S402 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
H3722 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2022
S905 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H2013 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
H1753 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S995 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1829
S895 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S36 (Similar To) 2021-06-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2470
S878 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S879 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S882 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S868 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
S2421 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3661 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2981 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
H3891 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2470 (Similar To) 2021-10-05 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted
S2471 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H4059 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4083 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2022
H1376 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4686
H2986 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S883 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S1419 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S402 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
H3722 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2022
S905 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H2013 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
H1753 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S995 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1829
S895 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S36 (Similar To) 2021-06-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2470
S878 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S879 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S882 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S868 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
S2421 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3661 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2981 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H78 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H78.pdf |